U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-04176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AQUINO-DE PAULA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Canceling Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.