U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-30114
  • Case Name: Robert R. Therrien
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Compliance/Non Compliance]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order Avoiding Lien Impairing Exemption (Sua Sponte)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.