U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-04149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguasvivas-Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Canceling Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2025: [Order]
  • April 05, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 05, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 27, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.