U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12453
  • Case Name: Football Nation Holdings, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.