U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.