U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10616
  • Case Name: Joselita Ardison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Intent]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.