U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosario
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.