U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11083
  • Case Name: Thomas D Menard and Kimberly S Menard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Refinance/Incur Debt]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Refinance/Incur Debt/Obtain Credit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.