U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30180
  • Case Name: Shannon L. Canavan and Dale E. Canavan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Signature Page]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order to Update]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.