U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30189
  • Case Name: Aneesh Sharma
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.