U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10639
  • Case Name: Katherine Mary Taraschke
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.