U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30195
  • Case Name: Patrick Jordan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Affidavit]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Update]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.