U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40321
  • Case Name: Julian Torres
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order to Update]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Order to Update]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.