U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10650
  • Case Name: Boston Harbor Distillery, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Signature Page]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Update]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Pay]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [For Order/Authority]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.