U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30205
  • Case Name: Adam Holbrook and Jennifer Holbrook
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Extend Time]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Extend Time]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Extend Time]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order to Update]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Order to Update]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.