U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10654
  • Case Name: Majestic Motors, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Dismiss Case]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Tax Documents]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Balance Sheet]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Cash Flow Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Equity Security Holders]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Vacate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Extend Time]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Employ]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Update]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Vote]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.