U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40330
  • Case Name: Alves HVAC Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amend]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amended Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Equity Security Holders]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Extend Time]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Vote]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Signature Page]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Payment of Fee (Final Online Installment Payment only)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order to Update]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.