U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.