U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40334
  • Case Name: Denise DeOliveira-Alves
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amend]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amend]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Extend Time]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Extend Time]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amend]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Signature Page]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion To Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order to Update]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.