U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10662
  • Case Name: Carlos Alexander Almendarez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Financial Affairs]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.