U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30210
  • Case Name: Allan M. Zielinski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Show Cause(Response)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Affidavit]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Impose Automatic Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.