U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10682
  • Case Name: Yuri Saintil
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Extend Time]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Extend Time]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order to Update]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.