U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30214
  • Case Name: Henri David Lafond
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Affidavit]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Impose Automatic Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Update]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.