U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40342
  • Case Name: Boothe Investments LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Vote]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Signature Page]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order to Update]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.