U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-06150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leandro-De Oliveira
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Canceling Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.