U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40356
  • Case Name: Bancroft Holding LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Request]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.