U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40355
  • Case Name: Ronald G. Verrette
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Signature Page]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Update]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.