U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10694
  • Case Name: Paul R Macy and Paula M Macy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Signature Page]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Update]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.