U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10704
  • Case Name: Best Choice Trucking, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Objection]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Objection]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order (Generic)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Employ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Cash Collateral]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Vote]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.