U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40376
  • Case Name: Clifton W Moore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Amended Motion/Application]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amend]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amended Motion/Application]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Signature Page]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order to Update]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.