U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abdul-Malik
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.