U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moreira Depaiva
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.