U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-06176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Debreczeni
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Complaint - Sealed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.