U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30227
  • Case Name: Stewart D. Scannell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Update]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Signature Page]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.