U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40409
  • Case Name: Arch Therapeutics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Refinance/Incur Debt]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [For Order/Authority]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Refinance/Incur Debt]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request for Hearing Audio File]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request for Hearing Audio File]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Refinance/Incur Debt]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Refinance/Incur Debt/Obtain Credit]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.