open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:16-cr-20513-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Pacheco
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 12c/Emergency Form 12c-2]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear*]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Merged Case]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Appointing Federal Community Defender]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdrawal of Attorney]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application - other]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion - Free]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion - Free]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Setting Conditions of Release ]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond ]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing on Motion*]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Requiring Responsive Pleading*]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond ]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order ]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment ]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Detention Pending Trial]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Appointing Federal Defender's Office]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Unseal]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Seal]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?309633
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =