open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00192-1
    Party Name:USA v. Croom
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Scheduling Progression of Case]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Merged Case]
    Date Published:July 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Appointing Federal Defender's Office]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Unseal]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Seal]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?320953
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =