Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00003-1
    Party Name:USA v. Alcantara-Burgos
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedited Sentencing (Joint Motion)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial and Jury Trial]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Interpreter Appeared]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.miwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?93416
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =