open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00117-1
    Party Name:USA v. Inman
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine ]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Ends of Justice Continuance]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Access Motion]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Ends of Justice Continuance]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Access Order]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Ex Parte Motion]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial and Jury Trial]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Scheduling Progression of Case]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.miwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?94517
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =