open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-11738
    Party Name:Oliver v. FCA U.S., L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Change of Address/Contact Information]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument*]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply - Free]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Case]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reference to Mediation Tribunal*]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion - Free]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion - Free]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?339398
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =