open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-11746
    Party Name:Lacy v. Equifax Information Services, LLC, a Georgia limited liability company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge*]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?339422
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =