open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-11745
    Party Name:Reynolds v. FCA US LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint, Amended]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing on Motion*]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?339421
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =