open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:5:19-cv-12384
    Party Name:Gary v. Bluestem Brands, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint, Amended]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge*]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340830
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =