open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00018-1
    Party Name:USA v. Trosclair
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Access Order]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Ex Parte Motion]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Final Pretrial]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document ]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Status Conference]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Rescheduling Trial]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Ends of Justice Continuance]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Ends of Justice Continuance]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing (All)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (ND)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing (Initial Pretrial Matters)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.miwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?95566
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =