open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00017-1
    Party Name:USA v. Carrick
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Admit Evidence]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Admit Evidence]
    Date Published:November 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Administrative Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Access Order]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Ex Parte Motion]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Application and Affidavit for Search/Seizure Warrant]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Status Conference]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Rescheduling Trial]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Ends of Justice Continuance]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Ends of Justice Continuance]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (ND)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing (Initial Pretrial Matters)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.miwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?95564
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =