open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-13293
    Party Name:Lashauna Lowry as Next Friend of Titus Jermaine Cromer Jr. v. Beaumont Health
  • Filing Type:Civil [Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint, Amended]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?343014
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =