open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-13306
    Party Name:Green III v. FCA US L.L.C.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?343041
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =