open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-13304
    Party Name:Fultz v. Abigail Hotels, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw Motion]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion - Free]
    Date Published:December 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Requiring Responsive Pleading*]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint, Amended]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?343039
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =