open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:19-55949-pjs
    Party Name:Daniel Anthony Chirco and Nicole Rae Chirco
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Final Decree and Case Closed]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Reaffirmation Agreement w/ Declaration and Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Certificate of Compliance of Submission of Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Certification of Compliance of Submission of Tax Returns]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:November 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [none]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?925103
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =