open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Michigan
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00127
    Party Name:Dean v. Diocese of Lansing et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Party]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Impending Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.miwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?97058
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =